General Info | TEI
Titel | Ministerratspräsidium |
---|---|
Labels |
|
ID | 2641 |
Type | None |
Date | 1867 - 1918 |
Collection(s) |
|
---|---|
Uri(s) |
https://mpr.acdh.oeaw.ac.at/apis/api2/entity/2127/ https://d-nb.info/gnd/1129291480 https://mpr.acdh.oeaw.ac.at/apis/api2/entity/3401/ https://mpr.acdh.oeaw.ac.at/entity/2641/ |
Relations
Institution
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Institution |
---|---|---|---|
— | — | Ist Oberbegriff von (Register) | Pressedepartement des Ministerrates |
Place
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Place |
---|---|---|---|
— | — | located in | Wien |
19.02.1867 | 11.11.1918 | located in | Wien |
Person
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Person |
---|---|---|---|
31.10.1916 | 13.12.1916 | — | Koerber, Ernest |
31.10.1916 | 13.12.1916 | — | Bobrzyński, Michael |
20.12.1916 | 23.06.1917 | — | Bobrzyński, Michael |
20.12.1916 | 23.06.1917 | — | Baernreither, Josef |
1916-12-20 | 1917-06-23 | — | Clam-Martinic, Heinrich [VERWECHSLUNGSGEFAHR] |
23.06.1917 | 25.07.1918 | — | Seidler, Ernst |
23.06.1917 | 25.07.1918 | — | Twardowski, Julius |
24.08.1917 | 22.07.1918 | — | Žolger, Ivan |
25.07.1918 | 27.10.1918 | — | Hussarek v. Heinlein, Max Ritter |
25.07.1918 | 27.10.1918 | — | Galecki, Kasimir |
Label
Label | Start | End | Label type | ISO Code |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ministerratspräsidium Cisleithanien | — | — | original mpr regest label | deu |
K. K. Ministerraths-Präsidium | — | — | alternative name | — |
K. K. Ministerrats-Präsidium | — | — | alternative name | — |
K.K. Ministerraths-Präsidium | — | — | alternative name | — |
Österreich-Ungarn. Ministerrats-Präsidium | — | — | alternative name | — |
K.K. Ministerrats-Präsidium | — | — | alternative name | — |
Ministerratspräsidium Cisleithanien | — | — | Legacy name (merge) | deu |
Ministerratspräsidium | — | — | Legacy name (merge) | deu |