General Info | TEI
Name | Plener, Ignaz |
---|---|
Alternative Names |
|
ID | 3557 |
Gender | male |
Lifespan | 1810-05-21 - 1908-02-17 |
Collection(s) |
|
---|---|
Uri(s) |
https://mpr.acdh.oeaw.ac.at/apis/api2/entity/3557/ https://d-nb.info/gnd/118595016 https://mpr.acdh.oeaw.ac.at/entity/3557/ |
Notes | This entry works as a sample for MPR TEI export |
References | RegierungsPloetz3; ÖMR-IV-2-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-IV-3-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-IV-3-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-V-1-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-V-2-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-V-3-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-V-4-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-V-5-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-V-6-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-V-7-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-V-8-Teilnehmer; ÖMR-V-9-Teilnehmer |
Relations
Institution
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Institution |
---|---|---|---|
1.2.1870 | 12.4.1870 | Mitglied von | Regierung Hasner |
15.1.1870 | 31.1.1870 | Ministerpräsident Cisleithanien | Ministerratspräsidium |
15.1.1870 | 31.1.1870 | Mitglied von | Regierung Plener |
24.9.1868 | 15.1.1870 | Mitglied von | Regierung Taaffe (1868–1870) |
15.1.1868 | 31.1.1870 | Minister für Landesverteidigung Cisleithanien | Ministerium für Landesverteidigung |
30.12.1867 | 12.4.1870 | Mitglied von | Bürgerministerium |
30.12.1867 | 12.4.1870 | Handelsminister Cisleithanien | Handelsministerium |
30.12.1867 | 24.9.1868 | Mitglied von | Regierung Carlos Auersperg |
09.12.1864 | 27.07.1865 | Finanzminister | Finanzministerium |
09.12.1864 | 27.07.1865 | Mitglied von | Regierung Mensdorff |
Person
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Person |
---|---|---|---|
— | — | parentof | Plener, Ernst |
Place
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Place |
---|---|---|---|
1810-05-21 | 1810-05-21 | born in | Wien |
1908-02-17 | 1908-02-17 | died in | Wien |
Label
Label | Start | End | Label type | ISO Code |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ignaz Edler v. Plener | — | — | alternative name | deu |
Dr. Ignaz Edler v. Plener | — | — | alternative name | deu |
Edler von Plener | — | — | alternative name | deu |
Plener, Ignaz Edler v. | — | — | MRP PrintIndex prefLabel CMR 02-0 | deu |