General Info | TEI
Titel | Regierung Stürgkh |
---|---|
Labels | |
ID | 4426 |
Type | Regierung |
Collection(s) |
|
---|---|
Uri(s) |
https://mpr.acdh.oeaw.ac.at/apis/api2/entity/4426/ https://mpr.acdh.oeaw.ac.at/entity/4426/ |
Relations
Institution
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Institution |
---|---|---|---|
03.11.1911 | 21.10.1916 | hat Untereinheit | Ministerium für Landesverteidigung |
Person
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Person |
---|---|---|---|
19.11.1911 | 01.07.1912 | — | Bráf, Albín |
19.11.1911 | 26.12.1913 | — | Długosz, Ladislaus |
20.09.1912 | 30.11.1915 | — | Schuster, Rudolf |
20.09.1912 | 21.10.1916 | — | Zenker, Franz |
08.10.1913 | 30.11.1915 | — | Engel, August |
02.01.1914 | 21.10.1916 | — | Morawski-Dzierżykraj, Zdzisław |
30.11.1915 | 29.08.1916 | — | Hohenlohe-Waldenburg-Schillingsfürst, Konrad Prinz zu |
30.11.1915 | 21.10.1916 | — | Leth, Karl |
30.11.1915 | 21.10.1916 | — | Spitzmüller, Alexander Bernhard |
29.08.1916 | 21.10.1916 | — | Handel, Erasmus |