General Info | TEI
Titel | Ungarische Hofkanzlei |
---|---|
Labels | |
ID | 3398 |
Type | None |
Date | 1859 - 1867 |
Collection(s) |
|
---|---|
Uri(s) |
https://mpr.acdh.oeaw.ac.at/apis/api2/entity/3398/ https://mpr.acdh.oeaw.ac.at/entity/3398/ |
Relations
Institution
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Institution |
---|---|---|---|
1859 | 1867 | Untereinheit von | Kaiserreich vor 1867 Verwaltung (non-existing) |
Place
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Place |
---|---|---|---|
1859 | 1867 | located in | Wien |
Person
Start | End | Other relation type | Related Person |
---|---|---|---|
25.05.1864 | 26.11.1864 | Ungarischer Hofkanzler [REVERSE] | Zichy, Hermann |
09.12.1864 | 26.06.1865 | Ungarischer Hofkanzler [REVERSE] | Zichy, Hermann |
29.07.1865 | 26.03.1866 | Ungarischer Hofkanzler [REVERSE] | Mailáth v. Székhely, Georg |
08.04.1866 | 06.02.1867 | Ungarischer Hofkanzler [REVERSE] | Mailáth v. Székhely, Georg |
— | — | Ehemaliger ungarischer Hofkanzler [REVERSE] | Mailáth v. Székhely, Anton |
— | — | Tavernikus [REVERSE] | Mailáth v. Székhely, Georg |
— | — | Zweiter ungarischer Hofkanzler [REVERSE] | Szőgyény v. Magyar-Szőgyén, Ladislaus |
— | — | Ungarischer Vizehofkanzler [REVERSE] | Károlyi, Eduard |
— | — | Zweiter ungarischer Hofkanzler [REVERSE] | Privitzer, Stephan |
— | — | Hofrat [REVERSE] | Barthos, Johann |